Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMOMBER v. WILKIE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02322
Date Filed2019-08-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffKAREN MOMBER
Case DescriptionKaren Momber, a nurse at the VA Medical Center in Battle Creek, Michign, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning the final report of the Administrative Investigation Board pertaining to charges brought against her that the AIB concluded were unfounded. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but despite several inquiries from Momber pertaining to the status of her request she heard nothing further from the agency and filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-021PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS against ROBERT L. WILKIE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6296315) filed by KAREN MOMBER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Wilkie, R., # 3 Summons OAGDC, # 4 Summons USAG, # 5 Summons USAADC)(Eisenberg, Michael) Modified event title on 8/15/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 08/02/2019)
2019-08-02Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zeg) (Entered: 08/02/2019)
2019-08-022SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ROBERT L. WILKIE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 08/02/2019)
2019-09-053NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of ROBERT L. WILKIE (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
2019-09-234Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by ROBERT L. WILKIE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 09/23/2019)
2019-09-23MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Respondent shall have up to and including October 28, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to the Petition for Writ of Mandamus. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/23/2019. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/23/2019)
2019-09-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/28/2019 (gdf) (Entered: 09/24/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar