Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLARIOS CHAVEZ v. U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02333
Date Filed2019-08-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffALEJANDRO LARIOS CHAVEZ
Case DescriptionAlejandro Larlos Chavez submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Customs and Border Protection and the Department of State for records about himself. The agencies acknowledged both requests but after hearing nothing further from either agency, Larlos Chavez filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-021COMPLAINT against U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6297809) filed by ALEJANDRO LARIOS CHAVEZ. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons AG, # 3 Summons AUSA, # 4 Summons CBP, # 5 Summons DOS)(Pierce, Daniel) (Entered: 08/02/2019)
2019-08-05Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zeg) (Entered: 08/05/2019)
2019-08-052SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 08/05/2019)
2019-08-083RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/8/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/7/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service - CBP, # 2 Affidavit of Service - U.S. Attorneys Office, # 3 Affidavit of Service - Attorney General)(Pierce, Daniel) (Entered: 08/08/2019)
2019-08-084RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/08/2019. (See Docket Entry 3 to view document) (jf) (Entered: 08/09/2019)
2019-08-125STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 08/12/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 08/12/2019)
2019-08-206NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball on behalf of All Defendants (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 08/20/2019)
2019-09-097Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-09MINUTE ORDER granting 7 consent motion for extension of time. Defendants shall file an answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by no later than September 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/9/2019. (lcegs2) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Answer Or Otherwise Response To Plaintiff's Complaint due by 9/23/2019. (mac) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar