Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGALDIERI v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02253
Date Filed2019-07-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffLOUIS V. GALDIERI
Case DescriptionLouis Galdieri, a writer and documentary filmmaker, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning a December 2017 opinion renewing mineral leases held by Twin Metals Minnesota allowing it to explore for minerals in the Superior National Forest. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and agreed to provide rolling releases. However, Galdieri's request was delayed by the awareness review program. Galdieri then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-261COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616099969) filed by LOUIS V. GALDIERI. (Attachment: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tth) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-07-26SUMMONS (3) Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (tth) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-07-262MOTION for CM/ECF Password by LOUIS V. GALDIERI. (tth) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-01MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's 2 Motion for CM/ECF password is GRANTED provided that he comply with all training requirements imposed by the Clerk's Office. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/01/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-273NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
2019-08-304Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 08/30/2019)
2019-09-03MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendant's 4 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file its Answer or response to the Complaint by October 15, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/3/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 09/03/2019)
2019-09-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/15/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
2019-09-135RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the U.S. Attorney General. Date of Service Upon U.S. Attorney General on 8/13/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service Dept of Interior, # 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Service Attorney General)(GALDIERI, LOUIS) Modified party served on 9/16/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 09/13/2019)
2019-09-136RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/30/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/29/2019. (See Docket Entry 5 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-10-157ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-16MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint briefing schedule by October 29, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/16/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 10/29/2019. (nbn) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-298Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
2019-10-29MINUTE ORDER ADOPTING the parties' 8 Joint Status Report. The Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by January 10, 2020; 2) Plaintiff shall file his opposition and cross-motion by February 10, 2020; 3) Defendant shall file its reply and opposition by March 13, 2020; and 4) Plaintiff shall file his reply by April 6, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/29/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
2019-10-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 1/10/2020. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/10/2020. Cross Motions due by 2/10/2020. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/13/2020. Response to Cross Motions due by 3/13/2020. Reply to Cross Motions due by 4/6/2020. (nbn) (Entered: 10/30/2019)
2019-12-119NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Sean Michael Tepe on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR Substituting for attorney Jason Cohen (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 12/11/2019)
2020-01-0210Joint MOTION to Stay Summary Judgment Briefing by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 01/02/2020)
2020-01-02MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) The parties' 10 Motion is GRANTED; 2) The dates set for briefing summary judgment are STAYED; and 3) The parties shall file a joint status report by February 7, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/2/2020. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 01/02/2020)
2020-01-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/7/2020. (nbn) (Entered: 01/06/2020)
2020-02-0711Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 02/07/2020)
2020-02-07MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS parties' 11 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by April 7, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/7/2020. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 02/07/2020)
2020-02-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/7/2020. (nbn) (Entered: 02/10/2020)
2020-04-0712Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 04/07/2020)
2020-04-07MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 12 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by June 8, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/7/2020. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 04/07/2020)
2020-04-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/8/2020. (nbn) (Entered: 04/07/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar