Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTelematch, Inc.
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02372
Date Filed2019-08-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffTELEMATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionTelematch, a company that analyzes agricultural data, submitted seven FOIA requests to the Department of Agriculture for records concerning various agricultural data elements. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but withheld data under Exemption 3 (other statutes) and Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). Telematch filed administrative appeals for all seven requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Telematch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Exemption 3 - Statutory prohibition of disclosure, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-061COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6305025) filed by Telematch, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramana, Anand) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/15/2019) (znmw). (Entered: 08/06/2019)
2019-08-072LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Telematch, Inc. (Ramana, Anand) (Entered: 08/07/2019)
2019-08-133ERRATA by TELEMATCH, INC. 1 Complaint filed by TELEMATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Ramana, Anand) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
2019-08-13Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zeg) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
2019-08-134SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
2019-08-205NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 08/20/2019)
2019-09-106Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-12MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, Defendant's 6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint by October 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/12/2019. (lctjk3) (Entered: 09/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar