Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02395
Date Filed2019-08-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Thomas F. Hogan
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning calendars and email communications for Katharine Gorka. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request for Gorka's emails but did not acknowledge receipt of the request for Gorka's calendar entries. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to either request, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-081COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6308657) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 08/08/2019)
2019-08-082LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 08/08/2019)
2019-08-08Case Assigned to Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (zeg) (Entered: 08/08/2019)
2019-08-083SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 08/08/2019)
2019-08-234RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/9/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/8/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/15/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 8/14/2019 (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 08/23/2019)
2019-09-095ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-196NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Marie Anthony on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar