Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRESTORE PUBLIC TRUST v. U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02410
Date Filed2019-08-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffRESTORE PUBLIC TRUST
Case DescriptionRestore Public Trust submitted four FOIA requests to the FDA for records concerning acting commissioner Norman Sharpless and GI Therapeutics, the company he created. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and referred the fourth request to the Department of Health and Human Services for processing. After hearing noting further from the agency, Restore Public Trust filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-091COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6311367) filed by RESTORE PUBLIC TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Civil Cover Sheet, # 12 Summons AG summons, # 13 Summons US Atty summons, # 14 Summons FDA summons, # 15 Summons HHS Summons)(Collette, Matthew) (Attachment 11 replaced on 8/9/2019) (zeg). (Entered: 08/09/2019)
2019-08-092ENTERED IN ERROR.....LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by RESTORE PUBLIC TRUST (Collette, Matthew) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/9/2019) (zeg). Modified on 8/9/2019 (zeg). (Entered: 08/09/2019)
2019-08-09NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 2 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (zeg) (Entered: 08/09/2019)
2019-08-09Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zeg) (Entered: 08/09/2019)
2019-08-093SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 08/09/2019)
2019-08-094LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by RESTORE PUBLIC TRUST (Collette, Matthew) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/14/2019) (zjf). (Entered: 08/09/2019)
2019-09-095NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball on behalf of All Defendants (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-166RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/26/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/25/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/26/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 8/26/2019; U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION served on 8/26/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit)(Collette, Matthew) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar