Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTHE JAMES MADISON PROJECT et al v. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02461
Date Filed2019-08-14
Date Closed2020-08-13
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffJAMES MADISON PROJECT
PlaintiffKADHIM SHUBBER
Case DescriptionThe James Madison Project and Financial Times reporter Kadhim Shubber submitted a FOIA request to the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency at the Department of the Treasury for records. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency withheld records under Exemption 5 (privilege) and Exemption 8 (bank examination reports). JMP and Shubber filed an administrative appeal of the denial. The agency acknowledged receipt of the appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, JMP and Shubber filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Opinion/Order [17]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-141COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6321199) filed by THE JAMES MADISON PROJECT, KADHIM SHUBBER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Rule 7.1 certification, # 3 Summons Treasury, # 4 Summons USADC, # 5 Summons USAG)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 08/14/2019)
2019-08-142LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JAMES MADISON PROJECT (zeg) (Entered: 08/15/2019)
2019-08-15Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zeg) (Entered: 08/15/2019)
2019-08-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 08/15/2019)
2019-08-274RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 8/19/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Summons Treasury)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
2019-08-275RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/19/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USAG receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
2019-08-276RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/19/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/18/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USADC receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
2019-09-187NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Evan Kahn on behalf of All Defendants (Kahn, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
2019-09-188ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY.(Kahn, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
2019-09-199Case randomly reassigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Judge Rudolph Contreras is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 09/20/2019)
2019-09-2710ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiffs, on or before October 25, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/27/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 09/27/2019)
2019-10-2411NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Alan Burch on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY Substituting for attorney Matthew Kahn (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-2512MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Frank D. Vance, Jr., # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Burch, Alan) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2019-11-0813Memorandum in opposition to re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JAMES MADISON PROJECT, KADHIM SHUBBER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Moss Declaration, # 2 Statement of Facts Response, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 11/08/2019)
2019-11-1314Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burch, Alan) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
2019-11-14MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant must file its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment 12 by November 22, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/14/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
2019-11-2215REPLY to opposition to motion re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Supplemental Declaration of Frank D. Vance, Jr.)(Burch, Alan) (Entered: 11/22/2019)
2020-08-1316ORDER. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 56 and 58, and the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, it is hereby ORDERED that defendant's motion for summary judgment 12 is GRANTED. This is a final, appealable order. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/13/2020. (lcabj2) (Entered: 08/13/2020)
2020-08-1317MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/13/2020. (lcabj2) (Entered: 08/13/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar