Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleACCURSO v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02540
Date Filed2019-08-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffANTHONY ACCURSO
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-19Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 8/19/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zjd) (Entered: 08/23/2019)
2019-08-191COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by ANTHONY ACCURSO. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement, # 2 Envelope)(zjd) (Entered: 08/23/2019)
2019-08-192MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANTHONY ACCURSO. (zjd) (Entered: 08/23/2019)
2019-08-193PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by ANTHONY ACCURSO. (zjd) (Entered: 08/23/2019)
2019-09-044ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff is obligated to pay an initial partial filing fee of $22.63 to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Columbia (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/03/2019. (zad) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-09Case Reassigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zad) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-105ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 09/10/19. (DM) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-106SUMMONS (4) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (zef, ) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-237RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 9/19/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 9/19/2019 (ztd) (Entered: 09/30/2019)
2019-10-118RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/10/19. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/9/2019. (ztd) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-16Partial Filing Fee Received from ANTHONY ACCURSO in the amount of $23.00, receipt number: 4616101063. (zrdj) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-11-129MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to FOIA Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Truong, John) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-2110NOTICE of Filing Certificate of Service by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Truong, John) (Entered: 11/21/2019)
2019-11-21MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' 9 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and their Answer or other response to the Complaint is due by December 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/21/19. (ms) (Entered: 11/21/2019)
2019-11-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or other response to the Complaint due by 12/12/2019. (dot) (Entered: 11/21/2019)
2019-12-1211ANSWER to 1 Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Truong, John) (Entered: 12/12/2019)
2019-12-1712ORDER directing defendant to file a status report by January 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/17/19. (ms) (Entered: 12/17/2019)
2019-12-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/17/2020. (dot) (Entered: 12/19/2019)
2020-01-1713STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 01/17/2020)
2020-01-22MINUTE ORDER: On consideration of defendant's 13 Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that defendant shall file its next Status Report, which may include a proposed schedule for briefing dispositive motions, by March 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/22/20. (ms) (Entered: 01/22/2020)
2020-03-0214NOTICE by ANTHONY ACCURSO (ztd); ("Leave to file Granted. Docket as a Notice." signed 3/2/2020 by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly) (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-1715STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
2020-04-27MINUTE ORDER: Defendant shall file its next Status Report, which may include a proposed schedule for briefing dispositive motions, by June 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/27/20. (ms) (Entered: 04/27/2020)
2020-06-0116STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar