Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGIACCHINO v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02545
Date Filed2019-08-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffANTHONY GIACCHINO
Case DescriptionAnthony Giacchino submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning video or film footage recorded by the FBI at the Fresh Kills Recovery Site on Staten Island after the September 11, 2001 terrorist attacks. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency provided Giacchino a DVD with redactions made under Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). Giacchino filed an administrative appeal of the agency's response. The agency upheld its original denial. Giacchino then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Defendant2255
DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-231COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6338165) filed by ANTHONY GIACCHINO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DOJ, # 3 Summons USADC, # 4 Summons USAG)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 08/23/2019)
2019-08-282ERRATA with Corrected Complaint by ANTHONY GIACCHINO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected Complaint)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
2019-08-28Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zeg) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
2019-08-283SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar