Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFrancis et al v. US Department of Justice
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2019cv01317
Date Filed2019-08-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Richard A. Jones
PlaintiffMegan Ming Francis
PlaintiffMatthew J Connelly
PlaintiffMary L Dudziak
PlaintiffMatthew L Jones
PlaintiffHiroshi Motomura
PlaintiffCampaign for Accountability
PlaintiffKnight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University
Case DescriptionMegan Ming Francis, an associate professor of political science at the University of Washington, along with other professors, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for all formal written Office of Legal Counsel opinions prior to February 1994. Francis and her colleagues also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. OLC told the requesters that the request potentially encompassed thousands of pages and indicated that the request would be put in the complex track for processing. The requesters suggested that OLC review a representative sampling as a way to narrow the number of pages. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Knight First Amendment Institute and the Campaign for Accountability filed suit on behalf of Francis and her colleagues.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUS Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-211COMPLAINT for disclosure against defendant(s) U.S. Department of Justice (Receipt # 0981-5894845) Attorney Katherine A. George added to party Campaign for Accountability(pty:pla), Attorney Katherine A. George added to party Matthew Connelly(pty:pla), Attorney Katherine A. George added to party Mary Dudziak(pty:pla), Attorney Katherine A. George added to party Megan Ming Francis(pty:pla), Attorney Katherine A. George added to party Matthew L. Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Katherine A. George added to party Knight First Amendment Institute(pty:pla), Attorney Katherine A. George added to party Hiroshi Motomura(pty:pla), filed by Campaign for Accountability, Mary Dudziak, Knight First Amendment Institute, Matthew Connelly, Megan Ming Francis, Matthew L. Jones, Hiroshi Motomura. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(George, Katherine) (Entered: 08/21/2019)
2019-08-212APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Alex Abdo FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Campaign for Accountability, Matthew Connelly, Mary Dudziak, Megan Ming Francis, Matthew L. Jones, Knight First Amendment Institute, Hiroshi Motomura (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5894931 (George, Katherine) (Entered: 08/21/2019)
2019-08-213APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jameel Jaffer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Campaign for Accountability, Matthew Connelly, Mary Dudziak, Megan Ming Francis, Matthew L. Jones, Knight First Amendment Institute, Hiroshi Motomura (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5894949 (George, Katherine) (Entered: 08/21/2019)
2019-08-214CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Campaign for Accountability, Matthew Connelly, Mary Dudziak, Megan Ming Francis, Matthew L. Jones, Knight First Amendment Institute, Hiroshi Motomura (George, Katherine) (Entered: 08/21/2019)
2019-08-215ORDER re 2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Alex Abdo for Plaintiffs Campaign for Accountability, Matthew Connelly, Mary Dudziak, Megan Ming Francis, Matthew L. Jones, Knight First Amendment Institute, Hiroshi Motomura by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS) (Entered: 08/21/2019)
2019-08-216ORDER re 3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jameel Jaffer for Plaintiffs Campaign for Accountability, Matthew Connelly, Mary Dudziak, Megan Ming Francis, Matthew L. Jones, Knight First Amendment Institute, Hiroshi Motomura by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS) (Entered: 08/21/2019)
2019-08-23Judge Richard A. Jones added. (SNP) (Entered: 08/23/2019)
2019-08-237Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) United States Department of Justice (SNP) (Entered: 08/23/2019)
2019-08-238STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 08/23/2019)
2019-08-309SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant US Department of Justice on 8/30/2019 (Abdo, Alex) (Entered: 08/30/2019)
2019-09-2310NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rebecca M Cutri-Kohart on behalf of Defendant US Department of Justice. (Cutri-Kohart, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/23/2019)
2019-09-2411ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/8/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/15/2019, Joint Status Report due by 10/22/2019, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 09/24/2019)
2019-09-2712ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by US Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cutri-Kohart, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/27/2019)
2019-10-04***Deadlines terminated and reset: By agreement of the parties, the initial case schedule deadlines set forth in the Court's 11 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT are vacated. The parties shall file a combined Joint Status Report by 11/14/2019 containing a proposed schedule for the processing and production of non-exempt, responsive records to Plaintiffs' FOIA request. In that Joint Status Report, the parties will include a statement of the nature and complexity of this FOIA litigation and the parties' views on further proceedings as directed by the Court's initial case scheduling order. (VE) (Entered: 10/04/2019)
2019-11-13Reset Deadline: Upon the joint request of the parties, the deadline for filing a combined Joint Status Report is extended to 12/5/2019. The Joint Status Report shall contain a proposed schedule for the processing and production of non-exempt, responsive records to Plaintiffs' FOIA request and shall include a statement of the nature and complexity of this FOIA litigation and the parties' views on further proceedings as directed by the Court's initial case scheduling order. (VE) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
2019-11-1413APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Anna Diakun FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Campaign for Accountability, Matthew J Connelly, Mary L Dudziak, Megan Ming Francis, Matthew L Jones, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Hiroshi Motomura (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6010314 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(George, Katherine) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
2019-11-1414ORDER re 13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Anna Diakun for Plaintiffs Campaign for Accountability,Anna Diakun for Matthew J Connelly,Anna Diakun Campaign for Accountability, Matthew J Connelly, Mary L Dudziak, Megan Ming Francis, Matthew L Jones, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Hiroshi Motomura by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
2019-12-0515JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: N/A. (Cutri-Kohart, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/05/2019)
2019-12-1016SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. Having considered the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, the Court adopts the parties' proposed deadlines regarding the production of documents. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) (VE) (Entered: 12/10/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar