Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSMITH v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02516
Date Filed2019-08-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffGRANT F. SMITH
DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-201COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616100288) filed by GRANT F. SMITH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tth) (Entered: 08/22/2019)
2019-08-202MOTION for Permission to Use Post Office Box by GRANT F. SMITH. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (tth) (Entered: 08/22/2019)
2019-08-203MOTION for CM/ECF Password by GRANT F. SMITH. (Attachment: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (tth) (Entered: 08/22/2019)
2019-08-20SUMMONS (3) Issued as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ztth) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
2019-09-064RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/26/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/25/2019.) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/26/2019. (ztth) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-255ANSWER to 1 Complaint by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE.(Tobin, Olga) (Entered: 09/25/2019)
2019-10-016CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE re 5 Answer to Complaint . (Tobin, Olga) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-07MINUTE ORDER granting 2 Plaintiff's Motion for Permission to Use Post Office Box and Agent Address. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff may use his post address box address for FOIA-related legal filings in this suit. It is FURTHER ORDERED that his contact information for such purposes is Grant F. Smith, IRmep, PO Box 32041, Washington, DC 20007, and that Plaintiff's designated phone number is (202) 342-7325. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on October 7, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-07MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule by October 21, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on October 7, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-07MINUTE ORDER granting 3 Plaintiff's Motion for CM/ECF Access. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff, having complied with the requirements of Local Civil Rule 5.4(b)(2), shall be granted a CM/ECF user name and password. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on October 7, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar