Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePOSSO v. US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictMiddle District of North Carolina
CityNCMD
Case Number1:2019cv00873
Date Filed2019-08-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeCHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER
PlaintiffJACOBO ROZO POSSO
DefendantUS DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-261FREEDOM OF INFORMATION ACT REQUEST, filed by JACOBO ROZO POSSO. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope - Front and Back)(Butler, Carol) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
2019-08-26Case Assigned to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Butler, Carol) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
2019-08-28CASE REFERRED for Screening (Butler, Carol) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
2019-10-012SUPPLEMENT to 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Plaintiff JACOBO ROZO POSSO. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar