Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRP Automotive, Inc. v. United States General Services Administration
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2019cv07473
Date Filed2019-08-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Otis D. Wright, II
PlaintiffRP Automotive, Inc.
doing business as Socal Penske Dealer Group
Case DescriptionRP Automotive, Inc., d/b/a Socal Penske Dealer Group, submitted a FOIA request to the General Services Administration for records concerning bids and responses to the agency's request for proposal for the U.S. Fleet of vehicles. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked Socal Penske to narrow and clarify its request. Socal Penske narrowed its request. Socal Penske made a number of inquiries checking on the status of its request, but after the agency failed to respond, Socal Penske filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States General Services Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-281COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24344432 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff RP AUTOMOTIVE, INC. D/B/A SOCAL PENSKE DEALER GROUP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12) (Attorney John S Kyle added to party RP AUTOMOTIVE, INC. D/B/A SOCAL PENSKE DEALER GROUP(pty:pla))(Kyle, John) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
2019-08-282CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff RP AUTOMOTIVE, INC. D/B/A SOCAL PENSKE DEALER GROUP. (Kyle, John) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
2019-08-283Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 2 filed by Plaintiff RP AUTOMOTIVE, INC. D/B/A SOCAL PENSKE DEALER GROUP. (Kyle, John) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
2019-08-284NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff RP AUTOMOTIVE, INC. D/B/A SOCAL PENSKE DEALER GROUP, identifying Roger S. Penske, Jr.. (Kyle, John) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
2019-08-295NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap) (Entered: 08/29/2019)
2019-08-296NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 08/29/2019)
2019-08-29730 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendant United States General Services Administration. (ghap) (Entered: 08/29/2019)
2019-08-308MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc) (Entered: 08/30/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar