Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02633
Date Filed2019-09-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice, Department of Health and Human Services, Department of Education, and the Department of the Interior for records concerning the agencies' undisclosed role in influencing media coverage. DFF also requested a fee waiver. The agencies' acknowledged receipt of the requests. DOJ told DFF that its request was being put in the complex queue for processing. After hearing nothing further from any of the agencies pertaining to the requests, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-031COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6353658) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit)(George, Aman) (Entered: 09/03/2019)
2019-09-032LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (George, Aman) (Entered: 09/03/2019)
2019-09-05Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zrdj) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
2019-09-053SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
2019-09-054STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 5, 2019. (lcbah4) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
2019-09-165RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/9/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/9/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 9/9/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 9/9/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 9/9/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 9/9/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/9/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(George, Aman) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-196NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-10-097ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar