Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWATERLEGACY v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02655
Date Filed2019-09-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffWATERLEGACY
Case DescriptionWaterLegacy submitted a FOIA request to EPA Region 5 for records concerning an email sent from the Minnesota Pollution Control Agency Assistant Commissioner to EPA Region 5 Chief of Staff. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, WaterLegacy filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-041COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6358100) filed by WATERLEGACY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - EPA R5 Comments, # 3 Exhibit Ex B - Minn Ct App orders, # 4 Declaration 26.1 Declaration, # 5 Summons Agency Summons, # 6 Summons DOJ Summons, # 7 Summons USAODC Summons)(Dinerstein, Paula) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/6/2019) (zeg). (Entered: 09/04/2019)
2019-09-042LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WATERLEGACY (zeg) (Entered: 09/06/2019)
2019-09-06Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zeg) (Entered: 09/06/2019)
2019-09-063ERRATA to Complaint Exhibit A by WATERLEGACY 1 Complaint, filed by WATERLEGACY. (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 09/06/2019)
2019-09-064SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/06/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar