Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Oversight v. U.S. Department of Justice et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2019cv08215
Date Filed2019-09-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Lorna G. Schofield
PlaintiffAmerican Oversight
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice and the FBI for records concerning the content of interviews conducted in relation to the agency's investigation into alleged campaign finance violations by Michael Cohen. American Oversight also requested expedited processing. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency denied American Oversight's request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Expedited processing, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-041COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17538734)Document filed by American Oversight. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Evers, Austin) (Entered: 09/04/2019)
2019-09-042CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Evers, Austin) (Entered: 09/04/2019)
2019-09-043RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Oversight.(Evers, Austin) (Entered: 09/04/2019)
2019-09-044REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by American Oversight. (Evers, Austin) (Entered: 09/04/2019)
2019-09-045REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by American Oversight. (Evers, Austin) (Entered: 09/04/2019)
2019-09-046MOTION for Daniel A. McGrath to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17542816. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Oversight. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit and Certificates of Good d Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Evers, Austin) (Entered: 09/04/2019)
2019-09-05***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Austin Ridgely Evers. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
2019-09-05CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (jgo) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
2019-09-05Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (jgo) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
2019-09-05Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
2019-09-057ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Bureau of Investigation. (jgo) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
2019-09-058ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of Justice. (jgo) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
2019-09-05>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 6 MOTION for Daniel A. McGrath to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17542816. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
2019-09-069ORDER granting 6 Motion for Daniel A. McGrath to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (jcs) (Entered: 09/06/2019)
2019-09-1310NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Alexander McGrath on behalf of American Oversight. (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
2019-09-1311AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE). Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019; U.S. Department of Justice served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Oversight. (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
2019-09-2012ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/5/2019 at 10:40 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (As further set forth in this order) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/20/2019) (ne) (Entered: 09/20/2019)
2019-10-0113NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Sheive Normand on behalf of Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-0214AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Court's Order and Individual Rules served on U.S. Department of Justice & Federal Bureau of Investigation on 9/23/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Oversight. (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 10/02/2019)
2019-10-1515ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice.(Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar