Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleACLU Southern California v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2019cv07774
Date Filed2019-09-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Philip S. Gutierrez
PlaintiffACLU Southern California
Case DescriptionThe ACLU of Southern California submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning reports prepared since 2008 by the ABA's Commission on Immigration pertaining to detention policies of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. The ACLU of Southern California also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency provided an interim response of 1,643 pages. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the ACLU of Southern California filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement a component of the Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-091COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 09/09/2019, receipt number 26K32RJK), receipt number 0973-24403440, filed by Plaintiff ACLU Southern California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B to Complaint, # 3 Exhibit C to Complaint, # 4 Exhibit D to Complaint) (Attorney Jason P Gonzalez added to party ACLU Southern California(pty:pla))(Gonzalez, Jason) Modified on 9/10/2019 (ghap). (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-092CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ACLU Southern California. (Gonzalez, Jason) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-093NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff ACLU Southern California. Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-00983 (Gonzalez, Jason) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-104NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-105NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-116ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant General Order 19-03 (identical case) by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Philip S. Gutierrez for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-07774 PSG(MRWx). (rn) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-117Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form 4 , Notice of Related Case(s) 3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 2 , Reassign Case pursuant to GO 19-03 (CV-81), 6 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form 5 filed by Plaintiff ACLU Southern California. (Gonzalez, Jason) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-118Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form 4 , Notice of Related Case(s) 3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 2 , Reassign Case pursuant to GO 19-03 (CV-81), 6 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form 5 filed by Plaintiff ACLU Southern California. (Gonzalez, Jason) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-119Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form 4 , Notice of Related Case(s) 3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 2 , Reassign Case pursuant to GO 19-03 (CV-81), 6 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form 5 filed by Plaintiff ACLU Southern California. (Gonzalez, Jason) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-1110Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form 4 , Notice of Related Case(s) 3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 2 , Reassign Case pursuant to GO 19-03 (CV-81), 6 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form 5 filed by Plaintiff ACLU Southern California. (Gonzalez, Jason) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-1211STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) (Entered: 09/12/2019)
2019-09-121260 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint 1 as to Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security. (bm) (Entered: 09/12/2019)
2019-09-121360 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint 1 as to Defendant United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (bm) (Entered: 09/12/2019)
2019-09-121460 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint 1 as to Attorney General William P. Barr. (bm) (Entered: 09/12/2019)
2019-09-121560 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint 1 as to David Harris, Civil Process Clerk, United States Attorney's Office (bm) (Entered: 09/12/2019)
2019-09-2616PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff ACLU Southern California, upon Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security served on 9/13/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to William P. Barr. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Gonzalez, Jason) (Entered: 09/26/2019)
2019-09-2617PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff ACLU Southern California, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to William P. Barr. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Gonzalez, Jason) (Entered: 09/26/2019)
2019-09-2618PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff ACLU Southern California, upon Defendant United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 9/13/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to William P. Barr. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Gonzalez, Jason) (Entered: 09/26/2019)
2019-09-2619PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff ACLU Southern California, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to William P. Barr. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Gonzalez, Jason) (Entered: 09/26/2019)
2019-09-2620PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff ACLU Southern California, upon Attorney General William P. Barr All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to William P. Barr. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to William P. Barr, Attorney General. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Gonzalez, Jason) (Entered: 09/26/2019)
2019-09-2621PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff ACLU Southern California, upon United States Attorney's Office All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to William P. Barr. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Gonzalez, Jason) (Entered: 09/26/2019)
2019-09-2622PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff ACLU Southern California, upon Civil Process Clerk, United States Attorney's Office All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to William P. Barr. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Gonzalez, Jason) (Entered: 09/26/2019)
2019-09-2623PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff ACLU Southern California, upon Chief, Civil Division, Office of the United States Attorney All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to David Harris, Chief, Civil Division. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to William P. Barr. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to David Harris, Chief, Civil Division. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Gonzalez, Jason) (Entered: 09/26/2019)
2019-10-1524STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Defendants United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security.(Attorney Matthew Jimenez Barragan added to party United States Department of Homeland Security (pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Jimenez Barragan added to party United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft))(Barragan, Matthew) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar