Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMULANGU et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02682
Date Filed2019-09-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffDEBORAH MULANGU
PlaintiffNYANKOYE DRAMOU
PlaintiffCATHOLIC CHARITIES
Case DescriptionOn behalf of Deborah Mulangu and Nyankoke Dramou, two asylum applicants, Catholic Charities submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for asylum assessment reports on both of them. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but refused to disclose any portion of the assessment reports even those portions that contained factual material. Catholic Charities alleged that USCIS has a policy and practice of providing entire assessment reports to immigration judges and appellate courts, often blindsiding the applicants in court. Mulangu, Dramou, and Catholic Charities then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Segregability - Disclosure of all non-exempt records, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-091COMPLAINT Deborah Mulangu, et al against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6364423) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Notice to Counsel/Party, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons)(Cleveland, David) Modified filer on 9/19/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-092NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by CATHOLIC CHARITIES, NYANKOYE DRAMOU, DEBORAH MULANGU. Case related to Case No. 15-cv-0459. (zeg) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-103ERRATA by DEBORAH MULANGU 1 Complaint, filed by DEBORAH MULANGU. (Cleveland, David) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-10Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zeg) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-104SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-105RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/10/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/10/2019. (Cleveland, David) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-166RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 9/12/2019 (Cleveland, David) Modified to correct party served on 9/17/2019 (ztd). (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-167RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09-13-2019. (Cleveland, David) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-268NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 09/26/2019)
2019-10-109MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-10MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's 9 Motion for an Extension of Time, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall respond to the plaintiffs' Complaint on or before November 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 10, 2019. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/12/2019. (tj) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/12/2019 (hs) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-1610ORDER REFERRING CASE for mediation. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 16, 2019. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-16CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson for mediation. (zad) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-18Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 12/3/2019 at 02:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (lcdar3) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-11-0811MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 11/08/2019)
2019-11-12MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's 11 Motion for an Extension of Time, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall respond to the plaintiffs' Complaint on or before January 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 12, 2019. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 1/17/2020, (hs) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
2019-11-1812First MOTION to Certify Class by DEBORAH MULANGU (Cleveland, David) (Entered: 11/18/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar