Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02693
Date Filed2019-09-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Office of Special Counsel at the Department of Justice for records concerning the issuance and maintenance of mobile devices used by Peter Strzok and Lisa Page. Judicial Watch also sent the request to the FBI. The FBI acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-091COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6365789) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Justice)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-092LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-10Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zeg) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-103SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-164ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/16/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/16/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/16/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 9/16/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) Modified on 9/18/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-165RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/16/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/16/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/16/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-18NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 4 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney, Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General, Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant was entered in error and was refiled as Docket Entry 5 . (znmw) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
2019-09-236NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 09/23/2019)
2019-09-307NOTICE of Appearance by Eric William Payne Lee on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Lee, Eric) (Entered: 09/30/2019)
2019-10-168ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-17MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by October 31, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/17/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 10/31/2019. (nbn) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-319Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
2019-10-31MINUTE ORDER ADOPTING the parties' 9 Joint Status Report. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall file another joint status report by December 2, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/31/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar