Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTOBIAS v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02699
Date Filed2019-09-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffJIMMY TOBIAS
Case DescriptionJimmy Tobias, a reporter, submitted 15 FOIA requests to the Department of the Interior for records concerning communications between various agency officials and third parties pertaining to a variety of issues, including himself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing substantive from the agency, Tobias filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
Complaint attachment 25
Complaint attachment 26
Complaint attachment 27
Complaint attachment 28
Complaint attachment 29
Complaint attachment 30
Complaint attachment 31
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-091COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6366629) filed by JIMMY TOBIAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Civil Cover Sheet, # 31 Summons)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-092NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of JIMMY TOBIAS (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-10Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zeg) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-103SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-10-074RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY served on 9/16/2019 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-075RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/17/2019. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-076RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/17/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/17/2019. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-167ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY.(Field, Brian) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-16MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by October 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/16/19. (lccrc2) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 10/30/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-308Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 10/30/2019)
2019-10-319MINUTE ORDER: The parties are directed to file a joint status report by December 4, 2019, which shall include an update on the status of production and their efforts to narrow the scope of review. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/31/19. (lccrc2) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
2019-10-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/4/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
2019-12-0410Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 12/04/2019)
2019-12-04MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file their next joint status report by January 4, 2020, which shall include an update on the status of production and their efforts to narrow the scope of review. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/4/19. (lccrc2) (Entered: 12/04/2019)
2020-01-0311Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 01/03/2020)
2020-01-03MINUTE ORDER: In light of 11 the parties' latest joint status report, the parties are directed to file their next joint status report by February 3, 2020, which shall include an update on the status of production and their efforts to narrow the scope of review. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/3/20. (lccrc2) (Entered: 01/03/2020)
2020-01-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/3/2020. (nbn) (Entered: 01/06/2020)
2020-02-0312Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 02/03/2020)
2020-02-06MINUTE ORDER: In light of 12 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to appear for a telephonic status conference on February 11, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/6/20. (lccrc2) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-06Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 2/11/2020 at 02:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (nbn) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-11MINUTE ORDER: As stated on the record at today's telephonic conference, the parties are directed to file their next status report by March 3, 2020, which shall include an update on the parties' efforts to narrow the scope of production. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/11/20. (lccrc2) (Entered: 02/11/2020)
2020-02-1113NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of JIMMY TOBIAS (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 02/11/2020)
2020-02-11Minute Entry for Telephone Conference held before Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/11/2020. Forthcoming Order. (Court Reporter: Lisa Moreira) (lsj) (Entered: 02/11/2020)
2020-03-0314Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 03/03/2020)
2020-03-05MINUTE ORDER: In light of 14 the parties' latest joint status report, the parties are directed to file their next joint status report by April 3, 2020 and one every sixty days thereafter. The Court encourages the parties to continue their efforts to narrow and/or prioritize the production. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/5/20. (lccrc2) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/3/2020 (lsj) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-04-0315Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 04/03/2020)
2020-06-0216Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/02/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar