Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGrassroots Leadership v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictWestern District of Texas
CityAustin
Case Number1:2019cv00872
Date Filed2019-09-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Robert Pitman
PlaintiffGrassroots Leadership
Case DescriptionGrassroots Leadership submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning a request for proposal solicitation from U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for operation of a detention center in Austin capable of handling 500 women. GRL also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted GRL's request for a fee waiver. GRL submitted a second FOIA request for records pertaining to an agreement between ICE and CoreCivic to operate a detention facility in Hutto. GRL's second FOIA request also asked for a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of that request but after hearing nothing further pertaining to either request, GRL filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security
DefendantU.S. Immigrations and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-091COMPLAINT For Injunctive and Declaratory Relief ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12579370). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Grassroots Leadership. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Natarajan, Ranjana) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-092REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Grassroots Leadership. (Natarajan, Ranjana) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-093REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Grassroots Leadership. (Natarajan, Ranjana) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-094REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Grassroots Leadership. (Natarajan, Ranjana) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-095REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Grassroots Leadership. (Natarajan, Ranjana) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-09Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-09If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (dl) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-116Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigrations and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(dl) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-197SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grassroots Leadership. Grassroots Leadership served on 9/12/2019, answer due 11/11/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit)(Natarajan, Ranjana) Modified answer due date on 9/19/2019 (afd). (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-198SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grassroots Leadership. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit)(Natarajan, Ranjana) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-19Set Deadlines: U.S. Department of Homeland Security answer due 11/11/2019. (afd) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-19Set Answer Deadlines: U.S. Immigrations and Customs Enforcement answer due 11/11/2019. (afd) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-11-119ANSWER to 1 Complaint, . Attorney Liane Ngin Noble-AUSA added to party U.S. Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Liane Ngin Noble-AUSA added to party U.S. Immigrations and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft) by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigrations and Customs Enforcement.(Noble-AUSA, Liane) (Entered: 11/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar