Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFriends of Animals v. Perdue et al
DistrictDistrict of Colorado
CityDenver
Case Number1:2019cv02569
Date Filed2019-09-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak
PlaintiffFriends of Animals
Case DescriptionFriends of Animals submitted a FOIA request to the Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service for records concerning licenses of permits issued to SeaQuest. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and subsequently told Friends of Animals that its request was being processed. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Friends of Animals filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantGeorge "Sonny&quo Perdue, III in his official capacity as United States Secretary of Agriculture
DefendantGeorge Sonny Perdue, III in his official capacity as United States Secretary of Agriculture
DefendantAnimal and Plant Health Inspection Service an agency of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-101COMPLAINT against Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, George Ervin Perdue, III (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6886842)Attorney Jennifer E. Best added to party Friends of Animals(pty:pla), filed by Friends of Animals. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, # 3 Summons Secretary of Agriculture, # 4 Summons US Attorney, # 5 Summons Attorney General)(Best, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-102Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-113SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-114MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Robert E. Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02569-STV . (sphil, ) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-115ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 11/12/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 10/29/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/5/2019, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/11/2019. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 09/12/2019)
2019-10-106NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Counsel by Laura J. McNabb on behalf of Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, George Sonny Perdue, IIIAttorney Laura J. McNabb added to party Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service(pty:dft), Attorney Laura J. McNabb added to party George Sonny Perdue, III(pty:dft) (McNabb, Laura) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-107STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, George Sonny Perdue, III. Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service answer due 11/6/2019; George Sonny Perdue, III answer due 11/6/2019. (McNabb, Laura) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-288CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, George Sonny Perdue, III All parties consent.. (McNabb, Laura) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-10-289Joint MOTION to Vacate Scheduling Conference and Set Joint Status Report Deadline by Defendants Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, George Sonny Perdue, III. (McNabb, Laura) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-10-2810ORDER granting 9 Motion to Vacate. The Scheduling Conference, set for 11/12/2019 11:00 AM, and associated deadlines are VACATED. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before 11/27/2019. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/28/2019. Text Only Entry(stvlc2, ) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-10-2911ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge 8 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/29/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
2019-11-0412Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendants Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, George Sonny Perdue, III. (McNabb, Laura) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-0413ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. The deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 12/6/2019. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 11/4/2019. Text Only Entry(stvlc2, ) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar