Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMACPHAIL v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02707
Date Filed2019-09-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffJOHN ANGUS MACPHAIL
Case DescriptionJohn MacPhail, a Canadian citizen, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning audio/video footage of his entry into the United States via the Nexus lane of the Pacific Coast Highway Crossing at Blaine, Washington. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, MacPhail filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-101COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6369205) filed by JOHN ANGUS MACPHAIL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Department of Homeland Security, # 3 Summons Customs and Border Protection, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons U.S. Attorney's Office)(Wolfsdorf, Bernard) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-102ERRATA by JOHN ANGUS MACPHAIL 1 Complaint, filed by JOHN ANGUS MACPHAIL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DHS, # 3 Summons CBP, # 4 Summons AG)(Wolfsdorf, Bernard) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-103REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 2 Errata filed by JOHN ANGUS MACPHAIL. Related document: 2 Errata filed by JOHN ANGUS MACPHAIL.(Wolfsdorf, Bernard) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-11Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zeg) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-114SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-115STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 11, 2019. (lcbah3) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-276RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/23/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/23/2019. (Wolfsdorf, Bernard) (Entered: 09/27/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar