Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCANEPA v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02711
Date Filed2019-09-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffCLINT CANEPA
Case DescriptionClint Canempa submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of the Army for records pertaining to his Combat-Related Special Compensation claim that had been denied by the Army even though Canempa had been determined to have suffered a combat-related disability by the Army Physical Disability Agency stemming from his service in Iraq. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Canempa filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-111COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6370116) filed by CLINT CANEPA. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Magistrate Consent Form, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Manne, Jason) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-11Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zeg) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-112SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-173RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CLINT CANEPA served on 9/13/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/16/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/17/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/17/2019.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USPS Receipt Army, # 2 Exhibit USPS Receipt US Attorney, # 3 Exhibit USPS Receipt Atty Gen)(Manne, Jason) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-10-104NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Allen Haugh on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY (Haugh, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-105Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haugh, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-11MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall file its Response on or before November 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/11/2019. (lcapm2) Modified document type on 10/16/2019 (zjd). (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-11-156Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haugh, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/15/2019)
2019-11-15MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant's Answer or Responsive Pleading shall be due on or before November 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/15/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 11/15/2019)
2019-11-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Answer or Responsive Pleading due by 11/29/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 11/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar