Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02719
Date Filed2019-09-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Treasury for records concerning any ethics opinions provided to Secretary Steve Mnuchin's pertaining to his recent investment in a money market fund which violated the statute authorizing Treasury prohibiting agency officials from trading in state or federal obligations. CREW also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-111COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6371331) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney General, # 3 Summons DC US Attorney, # 4 Summons Department of Treasury)(Beckerman, Laura) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-112LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Beckerman, Laura) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/12/2019) (zeg). (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-13Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zeg) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
2019-09-133SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
2019-09-194RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/17/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/17/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 9/17/2019 (Beckerman, Laura) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-10-175MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-18MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall file their answer or responsive pleading on or before November 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/18/19. (lccrc2) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-11-156ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY.(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 11/15/2019)
2019-11-15MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by December 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/15/19. (lccrc2) (Entered: 11/15/2019)
2019-11-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 12/6/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 11/18/2019)
2019-12-067STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 12/06/2019)
2019-12-09MINUTE ORDER: In light of 7 the parties' latest joint status report, the parties are directed to file their next joint status report by January 22, 2020, which shall include an update on the status of production. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/9/19. (lccrc2) (Entered: 12/09/2019)
2019-12-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/22/2020 (lsj) (Entered: 12/09/2019)
2020-01-228Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 01/22/2020)
2020-01-23MINUTE ORDER: In light of 8 the parties' latest joint status report indicating that production is complete, the parties are directed to file their next status report by March 12, 2020, which shall include an update on whether any issues remain and, if so, a joint proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/23/20. (lccrc2) (Entered: 01/23/2020)
2020-01-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/12/2020 (lsj) (Entered: 01/24/2020)
2020-03-119Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-11MINUTE ORDER: In light of 9 the parties' latest joint status report, the parties are directed to file their next status report by April 8, 2020, which shall include an update on whether any issues remain. Should they, summary judgment briefing shall proceed on the following schedule: The Government shall file its motion for summary judgment by May 22, 2020; Plaintiff shall file its opposition and cross-motion by June 5, 2020; The Government shall file its opposition and reply by June 26, 2020; Plaintiff shall file its reply by July 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/11/20. (lccrc2) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/8/2020. Summary Judgment motions due by 5/22/2020. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/5/2020. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/26/2020. Replies due by 7/10/2020. (lsj) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
2020-04-0810Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 04/08/2020)
2020-04-08MINUTE ORDER: In light of 10 the parties' latest joint status report, the briefing schedule set in the Court's March 11, 2020 Minute Order is hereby STAYED pending receipt of the parties' next joint status report. The parties shall file their next status report by May 6, 2020, which shall provide an update on whether any issues remain. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/8/20. (lccrc2) (Entered: 04/08/2020)
2020-04-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/6/2020 (lsj) (Entered: 04/09/2020)
2020-05-0611Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 05/06/2020)
2020-05-11MINUTE ORDER: In light of 11 the parties' latest joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the case shall continue to be STAYED pending receipt of the parties' next joint status report, which shall be filed by June 15, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/11/20. (lccrc2) (Entered: 05/11/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar