Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02728
Date Filed2019-09-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted five FOIA requests to the Department of State for records concerning the Trump administration's Middle East polices and potential conflicts of interest for Deputy Secretary for Legislative Affairs Charles Faulkner. The agency acknowledged receipt of all the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of the requests, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-121COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6372802) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 09/12/2019)
2019-09-122LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 09/12/2019)
2019-09-16Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zeg) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-10-034RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/17/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/17/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-04NOTICE OF ERROR re 4 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney; emailed to daniel.mcgrath@americanoversight.org, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Document incomplete/illegible, 2. Please refile document, 3. as to the USAG and Federal Dft for service of process (zjf, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)
2019-10-175ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-18MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before November 15, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/18/2019. (lcabj3) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall either file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, by 11/15/2019. (jth) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar