Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRADELAT v. UNITED STATES COAST GUARD
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02731
Date Filed2019-09-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffANA RADELAT
Case DescriptionAna Radlat, the Washington correspondent for the online news service the Connecticut Mirror, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Coast Guard for records concerning sexual assault or sexual misconduct complaints reported at the Coast Guard Academy. Radelat also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency Radelat filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES COAST GUARD
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-121COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES COAST GUARD ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6373963) filed by ANA RADELAT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Rosenbaum, Adina) (Entered: 09/12/2019)
2019-09-16Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zeg) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-162GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 9/16/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-164RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/16/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/16/2019. (Rosenbaum, Adina) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-10-025RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/20/19. (Rosenbaum, Adina) (Entered: 10/02/2019)
2019-10-166NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Viggiano Valdivia on behalf of UNITED STATES COAST GUARD (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-167Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar