Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSPARACINO PLLC v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02732
Date Filed2019-09-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffSPARACINO PLLC
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Sparacino LLP, representing U.S. citizens who were injured or killed by terrorist attacks in Iraq, submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of the Treasury for records concerning the Iraqi Finance Ministry. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Sparacino LLP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-121COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FREEDOM OF INFORMATION ACT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6374012) filed by SPARACINO PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Branson, Joshua) (Entered: 09/12/2019)
2019-09-122NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Edward Goldsmith on behalf of SPARACINO PLLC (Goldsmith, Andrew) (Entered: 09/12/2019)
2019-09-123NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M. Duffy on behalf of SPARACINO PLLC (Duffy, Matthew) (Entered: 09/12/2019)
2019-09-16Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zeg) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-164SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-235STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 09/23/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 09/23/2019)
2019-10-036RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/23/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/23/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Duffy, Matthew) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-037RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/23/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Duffy, Matthew) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-038RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 9/23/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Duffy, Matthew) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-159NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-2310ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 10/23/2019)
2019-10-24MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA"), 5 U.S.C. § 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than November 20, 2019. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) The status of Plaintiff's FOIA requests; (2) The anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA requests; (3) The anticipated date(s) for release of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA requests; (4) Whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) Whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) Whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) A proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each party's individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/24/2019. (lcegs3) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Scheduling Order For Further Proceedings due by 11/20/2019. (mac) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-11-2011Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-11-21MINUTE ORDER. In view of the 11 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report by no later than December 20, 2019, informing the Court of the status of Defendant's searches and proposing a recommendation for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/21/2019. (lcegs3) (Entered: 11/21/2019)
2019-11-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/20/2019. (mac) (Entered: 11/21/2019)
2019-12-1812Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 12/18/2019)
2019-12-19MINUTE ORDER. In view of the 12 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report by no later than January 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/19/2019. (lcegs3) (Entered: 12/19/2019)
2019-12-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Joint Status Report due by 1/20/2020. (mac) (Entered: 12/19/2019)
2020-01-1713Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 01/17/2020)
2020-01-17MINUTE ORDER. In view of the 13 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report by no later than February 20, 2020, informing the Court of the results of the search to date and proposing a processing protocol. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/17/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 01/17/2020)
2020-01-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/20/2020. (mac) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
2020-02-2014NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Robert Aaron Caplen on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY Substituting for attorney Damon W. Taaffe (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 02/20/2020)
2020-02-2015Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 02/20/2020)
2020-02-21MINUTE ORDER. In view of the 15 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than March 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/21/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-02-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/20/2020. (mac) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-03-1816Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 03/18/2020)
2020-03-20MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report. The parties shall file the joint status report by no later than March 27, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/20/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 03/20/2020)
2020-03-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/27/2020 (mac) (Entered: 03/20/2020)
2020-03-2717Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 03/27/2020)
2020-04-01MINUTE ORDER. In view of the 17 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report by no later than April 29, 2020, informing the Court of the status of Defendant's operations in light of the COVID-19 (coronavirus) pandemic. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/1/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 04/01/2020)
2020-04-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/29/2020. (mac) (Entered: 04/02/2020)
2020-04-2918Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 04/29/2020)
2020-05-01MINUTE ORDER. In view of 18 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than June 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 5/1/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 05/01/2020)
2020-05-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/1/2020. (mac) (Entered: 05/01/2020)
2020-06-0119Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-02MINUTE ORDER. In view of 19 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than July 7, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 6/2/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 06/02/2020)
2020-06-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/7/2020. (mac) (Entered: 06/03/2020)
2020-07-0720Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 07/07/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar