Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFreedom Northwest Credit Union v. National Credit Union Administration
DistrictDistrict of Idaho
CityDatabaseVersion 6.2.2 Moscow - Central
Case Number3:2019cv00351
Date Filed2019-09-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge David C. Nye
PlaintiffFreedom Northwest Credit Union
Case DescriptionThe Freedom Northwest Credit Union submitted a FOIA request to the National Credit Union Administration for records concerning guidelines for NCUA. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further, Freedom National Credit Union filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNational Credit Union Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-121COMPLAINT against NATIONAL CREDIT UNION ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1938762.), filed by FREEDOM NORTHWEST CREDIT UNION. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Creason, Samuel)
2019-09-12NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ckh)
2019-09-122Summons Issued as to National Credit Union Administration. (Print attached Summons for service.) (ckh)
2019-09-133Corporate Disclosure Statement by Freedom Northwest Credit Union. (Creason, Samuel)
2019-10-154STIPULATION re 1 Complaint by National Credit Union Administration. (Woychick, Nicholas)
2019-10-165DOCKET ENTRY ORDER. The stipulation filed by the parties in this case (Dkt. 4 ) is hereby APPROVED. Defendant shall have until November 8, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (bb)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar