Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02743
Date Filed2019-09-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning the email that initiated the investigation of Russian interference in the 2016 election. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-131COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6377011) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Justice)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
2019-09-132LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
2019-09-16Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zeg) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-234RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/23/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/23/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/23/2019)
2019-09-235RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/23/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 9/23/2019. (See Docket Entry 4 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 09/27/2019)
2019-09-306NOTICE of Appearance by Chris Fedeli on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 09/30/2019)
2019-10-237MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Truong, John) (Entered: 10/23/2019)
2019-10-24MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Defendant's 7 Motion for Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and that Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before November 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 24, 2019. (lccjn1) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Response To The Complaint due by 11/22/2019, (mac) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-11-218ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Truong, John) (Entered: 11/21/2019)
2019-11-25MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this Freedom of Information Act case are a Complaint and an Answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) appear to be inapplicable. It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before December 13, 2019. The Joint Status Report shall address: (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force , 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the Parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 25, 2019. (lccjn1) (Entered: 11/25/2019)
2019-11-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/13/2019. (mac) (Entered: 11/25/2019)
2019-12-069Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 12/06/2019)
2019-12-06MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report on or before March 6, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 6, 2019. (lccjn2) (Entered: 12/06/2019)
2019-12-06Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 3/6/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 12/08/2019)
2020-02-2710STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on February 27, 2020. (lccjn1) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-03-0211Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 03/02/2020)
2020-03-03MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report on or before April 7, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 3, 2020. (lccjn1) (Entered: 03/03/2020)
2020-03-03Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 4/7/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 03/10/2020)
2020-04-0312Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 04/03/2020)
2020-04-06MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report on or before June 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 6, 2020. (lccjn1) (Entered: 04/06/2020)
2020-05-2913Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-06-02MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report on or before July 15, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 2, 2020. (lccjn1) (Entered: 06/02/2020)
2020-06-0414NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. Attorney Chris Fedeli terminated. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 06/04/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar