Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFOSTER v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02744
Date Filed2019-09-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffHELEN FOSTER
Case DescriptionHelen Foster, an employee of HUD, submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of Housing and Urban Development. Her first FOIA request asked for records about herself that had been disclosed to reporters. Her second FOIA request asked for records provided to the House Oversight Committee in response to an information request. Her third FOIA request asked for records concerning the investigation of a hostile workplace complaint filed against her. The agency provided interim responses to the first two requests. The agency told Foster it was processing her third request. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of her requests, Foster filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-131COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief to Obtain Freedom of Information Act Information against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6377114) filed by HELEN FOSTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons HUD, # 3 Summons U.S. AG Barr, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney for DC)(London, Ronald) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
2019-09-16Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zeg) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-162GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 9/16/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-234RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT served on 9/18/2019 (London, Ronald) (Entered: 09/23/2019)
2019-09-235RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/17/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/17/2019. (London, Ronald) (Entered: 09/23/2019)
2019-09-236RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/17/2019. (London, Ronald) (Entered: 09/23/2019)
2019-10-017NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-178ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT.(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-21MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall review this Court's 2 General Order and Guidelines Applicable to FOIA Cases, and promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for disclosure or briefing motions for summary judgment, on or before 11/4/2019. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/21/2019. (jag) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-10-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 11/4/2019. (zgdf) (Entered: 10/22/2019)
2019-11-049Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-12MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 12/17/2019, the parties shall file a further joint status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/12/2019. (jag) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar