Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBank of Louisiana v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
DistrictEastern District of Louisiana
CityNew Orleans
Case Number2:2019cv12594
Date Filed2019-09-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Martin L.C. Feldman
PlaintiffBank of Louisiana
Case DescriptionThe Bank of Louisiana submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation for records concerning the decision of an administrative law judge. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied the Bank's request. The Bank then filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Bank of Louisiana filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantFederal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-131COMPLAINT with jury demand against Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7855323) filed by Bank of Louisiana. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Statement, # 4 Affidavit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit)Attorney Arthur Anthony Lemann, IV added to party Bank of Louisiana(pty:pla).(Lemann, Arthur) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/16/2019) (pp). (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/16/2019) (pp). (Entered: 09/13/2019)
2019-09-162Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (aj) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-163Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 1 Complaint. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet and Summons. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action necessary.** (pp) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-164Summons Issued as to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (pp) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-185ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle, Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 9/16/2019.(jls) (NEF: Case Mgrs. Sects. B & F, F Chambers) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
2019-09-206Summons Submitted for Issuance (Lemann, Arthur) (Entered: 09/20/2019)
2019-09-237Summons Issued as to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (sa) (Entered: 09/23/2019)
2019-09-238MOTION to Stay Hearing by Bank of Louisiana. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/9/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Submission, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Lemann, Arthur) (Entered: 09/23/2019)
2019-09-239EXPARTE/CONSENT Ex Parte MOTION to Expedite Motion to Stay Hearing by Bank of Louisiana. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lemann, Arthur) (Entered: 09/23/2019)
2019-09-2410Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 8 MOTION to Stay Hearing , 9 Ex Parte MOTION to Expedite Motion to Stay Hearing . Documents do not contain Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Magistrate (1). (clw) (Entered: 09/24/2019)
2019-09-2511ORDER denying as moot 8 Motion to Stay Hearing and 9 Motion to Expedite Motion to Stay Hearing, as stated within document. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/25/2019. (cbs) (Entered: 09/25/2019)
2019-10-0212Summons Submitted for Issuance (Lemann, Arthur) (Entered: 10/02/2019)
2019-10-0213Summons Submitted for Issuance (Lemann, Arthur) (Entered: 10/02/2019)
2019-10-0414Summons Issued as to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(sa) (Entered: 10/04/2019)
2019-10-1015Summons Issued as to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (sa) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar