Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCA Planned Parenthood Education Fund v. U.S. DHHS
DistrictEastern District of California
CitySacramento
Case Number2:2019cv01848
Date Filed2019-09-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Kimberly J. Mueller
PlaintiffCalifornia Planned Parenthood Education Fund
Case DescriptionThe California Planned Parenthood Education Fund submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning the agency's grant of a Title X application to Oberia, a first-time recipient that did not offer comprehensive family planning services. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, California Planned Parenthood Educational Fund filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-131COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Health and Human Services by California Planned Parenthood Education Fund. Attorney Kelley, Mary Kathryn added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8460500) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A- April 22, 2019, CPPEF Request, # 3 Exhibit B- April 25, 2019, Response to CPPEF, # 4 Exhibit C- May 6, 2019, Documents Provided by CPPEF, # 5 Exhibit D- August 1, 2018, CPPEF Request)(Kelley, Mary) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
2019-09-162SUMMONS ISSUED as to *U.S. Department of Health and Human Services* with answer to complaint due within *30* days. Attorney *Mary Kathryn Kelley* *Cooley LLP* *4401 Eastgate Mall* *San Diego, CA 92121*. (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-163CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Consent Form, # 3 VDRP) (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-174CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff California Planned Parenthood Education Fund. (Kelley, Mary) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-245SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by California Planned Parenthood Education Fund. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services served on 9/19/2019. (Kelley, Mary) Modified on 9/24/2019 (Kaminski, H). (Entered: 09/24/2019)
2019-09-246CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by California Planned Parenthood Education Fund re 3 Civil New Case Documents for KJM. (Kelley, Mary) (Entered: 09/24/2019)
2019-10-187ANSWER by U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. Attorney Olsen, Edward A. added.(Olsen, Edward) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar