Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02751
Date Filed2019-09-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration for records concerning the removal of Tim Gallaudet as acting administrator that were sent to a list of named individuals. DFF also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-161COMPLAINT against NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6378961) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-162LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-16Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zeg) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-184MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael C. Martinez, :Firm- Democracy Forward Foundation, :Address- 1333 H Street, NW, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - (202) 701-1788. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6384329. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
2019-09-195RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/19/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/19/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/19/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION served on 9/19/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-19MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice : Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that Michael C. Martinez is admitted to represent Plaintiff pro hac vice in this case. The Court notes that Mr. Martinez maintains an office within the District of Columbia and that his admission to the District of Columbia Bar is pending. In light of Local Civil Rule 83.2(c)(2), Mr. Martinez is instructed to apply for admission to the Bar of this Court as soon as his admission to the District of Columbia Bar is complete. The Court also notes that the motion did not include the meet-and-confer statement required under the Local Rules for all non-dispositive motions. See D.D.C. Civ. R. 7(m). The parties are reminded for future reference that all motions must comply with the Local Rules. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/19/2019. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-10-186ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar