Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTummings v. Homeland Security et al
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityBaltimore
Case Number1:2019cv02740
Date Filed2019-09-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Stephanie A. Gallagher
PlaintiffMichael Colin Tummings
Case DescriptionMichael Tummings submitted two FOIA requests to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning his Alien file and the 1962 record of his admission to the U.S. from Jamaica. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Tummings filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantHomeland Security
DefendantUS Citizenship and Immigration Services
DefendantUSCIS National Benefits Center
DefendantUSCIS National Records Center
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-161COMPLAINT and Action in Mandamus for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and under FOIA against Homeland Security, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, USCIS National Benefits Center, USCIS National Records Center ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8236528.), filed by Michael Colin Tummings. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge, # 3 Table of Exhibits, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Exhibit L, # 16 Summons US Attorney, # 17 Summons Attorney General of the US, # 18 Summons Department of Homeland Security, # 19 Summons USCIS, # 20 Summons USCIS National Benefits Center, # 21 Summons USCIS National Records Center)(Green, Brian) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-162NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Scott Green on behalf of Michael Colin Tummings (Green, Brian) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-163NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Michael Colin Tummings or counsel for Michael Colin Tummings are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded here . Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded here , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded here . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 9/30/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-164Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 9/16/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-175Summons Issued 60 days as to Homeland Security, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, USCIS National Benefits Center, USCIS National Records Center, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-177CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Colin Tummings re 4 25 Pct Mag - Case Management Order Served on Defendants by USPS certified mail (Green, Brian) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-258SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Colin Tummings. USCIS National Records Center served on 9/20/2019, answer due 11/19/2019.(Green, Brian) (Entered: 09/25/2019)
2019-09-299SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Colin Tummings. USCIS National Benefits Center served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019.(Green, Brian) (Entered: 09/29/2019)
2019-10-1810NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michael Colin Tummings (Green, Brian) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-18Case reassigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar