Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSea Shepherd Legal v. National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration et al
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2019cv01485
Date Filed2019-09-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James L. Robart
PlaintiffSea Shepherd Legal
Case DescriptionSea Shepherd Legal submitted a FOIA request to the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration for records concerning the Maui dolphin. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Sea Shepherd Legal that it was processing the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Sea Shepherd Legal filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNational Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration an agency of the United States
DefendantNational Marine Fisheries Service an agency of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-161COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5927010), filed by Sea Shepherd Legal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-162PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Legal (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-163CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Legal. (Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-164NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:19-cv-463, by Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Legal. (Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-165PRAECIPE by Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Legal (Attachments: # 1 Complaint)(Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-166PRAECIPE to attach document re 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Legal (Attachments: # 1 ATTORNEY INFORMATION FOR PLAINTIFF SEA SHEPHERD LEGAL)(Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-167CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Sea Shepherd Legal (Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-17U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (GT) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-178Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration and National Marine Fisheries Service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(GT) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-179NOTICE TO FILER: re 2 Praecipe for a Summons. Notice of Filing Deficiency ** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (GT) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-1710PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Legal (Attachments: # 1 Summons - U.S. Attorney)(Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-18** Case has been reassigned to the Honorable James L. Robart, United States District Judge as the Honorable Judge John C. Coughenour, United States District Judge is no longer assigned to the case. Counsel shall now use the following case number on all subsequent pleadings: CV19-1485-JLR ** (PP) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
2019-09-1811Summons Electronically Issued as to US Attorney for the Western District of Washington (SWT) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar