Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKertchen v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CityTacoma
Case Number3:2019cv05871
Date Filed2019-09-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Benjamin H. Settle
PlaintiffVitaliy Kertchen
Case DescriptionVitaliy Kertchen, an attorney specializing in the restoration of gun rights to otherwise prohibited individuals, submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records from the National Instant Criminal Background Check System's state prohibitor pages. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Kertchen filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-161COMPLAINT against defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation, filed by Vitaliy Kertchen. (Summons(es) to be issued) (Receipt # TAC015873) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Transmittal Email)(SP) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-162NOTICE: Plaintiff Vitaliy Kertchen has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (PS) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-173Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(SP) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-10-105ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 1/8/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/26/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/2/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-216NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-10-217ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Federal Bureau of Investigation.(Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-12-198STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for relief from discovery deadlines by parties (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 12/19/2019)
2019-12-209ORDER re 8 Stipulation for Relief filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. Joint Status Report due by 1/31/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
2020-01-3110Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Order by Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-02-0611ORDER re 10 Status Report filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation: Next Joint Status Report is due by 2/28/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-2012MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Plaintiff Vitaliy Kertchen. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/3/2020 8/14/2020, (Kertchen, Vitaliy) Modified on 5/8/2020 (SP). (Entered: 02/20/2020)
2020-02-2013DECLARATION of Vitaliy Kertchen filed by Plaintiff Vitaliy Kertchen re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Kertchen, Vitaliy) (Entered: 02/20/2020)
2020-02-2814Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 02/28/2020)
2020-03-2315STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to vacate and stay deadlines by parties (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 03/23/2020)
2020-03-2316DECLARATION of Seidel re 15 Stipulation by Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 03/23/2020)
2020-03-2417ORDER granting 15 STIPULATED MOTION AND ORDER TO VACATE AND STAY DEADLINES; signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (SP) (Entered: 03/24/2020)
2020-05-0718Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Briefing Schedule , filed by Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation. Noting Date 5/7/2020, (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 05/07/2020)
2020-05-0819ORDER ON STIPULATED MOTION AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE: For good cause, the Court orders the following briefing schedule for Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, Dkt. No. 12 : FBI's Response due 7/15/2020. Plaintiff's Reply due 8/14/2020. Noting Date for 12 Motion for Summary Judgment is 8/14/2020; signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (SP) (Entered: 05/08/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar