Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEGAL SERVICES OF EASTERN MISSOURI v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02782
Date Filed2019-09-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffLEGAL SERVICES OF EASTERN MISSOURI
Case DescriptionLegal Services of Eastern Missouri submitted a FOIA request to the Department Housing and Urban Development for records concerning the agency's involvement in public housing in Wellston. Legal Services also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied Legal Services' request for a fee waiver, asking instead for a commitment to pay fees. Legal Services filed an administrative appeal of the denial of its fee waiver request. The agency denied Legal Services' administrative appeal and requested the agency pay $2,366 as a down payment on fees. Legal Services then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-171COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6382269) filed by LEGAL SERVICES OF EASTERN MISSOURI. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons (U.S. Attorney), # 3 Summons (Attorney General), # 4 Summons (Agency))(Llewellyn, Patrick) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/19/2019) (zeg). (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-172LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LEGAL SERVICES OF EASTERN MISSOURI (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-173NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Kirkpatrick on behalf of LEGAL SERVICES OF EASTERN MISSOURI (Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-19Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zeg) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-194SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-195RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/19/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/19/2019. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-276NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 09/27/2019)
2019-10-217ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT.(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-10-21MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues no later than 12/9/19. The joint status report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/21/19. (DJS) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-10-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/9/2019. (tg) (Entered: 10/22/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar