Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFriends of the Earth v. National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityGreenbelt
Case Number8:2019cv02745
Date Filed2019-09-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge George Jarrod Hazel
PlaintiffFriends of the Earth
Case DescriptionFriends of the Earth submitted a FOIA request to the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration for records concerning how the agency processes FOIA requests, particularly fee waivers. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency disclosed 19 records as part of an interim response. The agency later told FoE that it had found 8,700 potentially responsive emails and that it would continue processing the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, FoE filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantNational Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-171COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8237899.), filed by Friends of the Earth. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons to NOAA, # 3 Summons Summons to Robert Hur, # 4 Summons Summons to William Bar)(Miller, Susan) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-172Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Friends of the Earth (Miller, Susan) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-173MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher D. Eaton (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8237990.) by Friends of the Earth(Miller, Susan) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-174MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stephen D. Mashuda (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8238004.) by Friends of the Earth(Miller, Susan) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-175QC NOTICE: 3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Friends of the Earth needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-176QC NOTICE: 4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Friends of the Earth needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-177CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stephen D. Mashuda by Friends of the Earth. The fee has already been paid.(Miller, Susan) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-178CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher D. Eaton by Friends of the Earth. The fee has already been paid.(Miller, Susan) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-189PAPERLESS ORDER granting 7 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Stephen Daniel Mashuda. Directing attorney Stephen Daniel Mashuda to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 9/18/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
2019-09-1810PAPERLESS ORDER granting 8 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher Eaton. Directing attorney Christopher Eaton to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 9/18/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
2019-09-1811Summons Issued 60 days as to National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
2019-09-1812NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Friends of the Earth or counsel for Friends of the Earth are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded here . Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded here , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded here . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 10/2/2019. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
2019-09-1813Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 9/18/2019. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
2019-09-1814NOTICE by Friends of the Earth to Clerk Requesting Re-issuance of Summonses to Federal Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Summons to NOAA, # 2 Summons to Robert Hur, # 3 Summons to William Barr)(Miller, Susan) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
2019-09-2415Summons Reissued 60 days as to National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/24/2019)
2019-10-0417SUMMONS Returned Executed by Friends of the Earth. National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration served on 9/27/2019, answer due 11/26/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service on William Barr, # 2 Proof of Service on Robert Hur)(Miller, Susan) (Entered: 10/04/2019)
2019-10-09Case Reassigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar