Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Civil Liberties Union Foundation of New Hampshire v. US Customs and Border Protection
DistrictDistrict of New Hampshire
CityConcord
Case Number1:2019cv00977
Date Filed2019-09-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Landya B. McCafferty
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union Foundation of New Hampshire
Case DescriptionThe ACLU of New Hampshire submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning CBP's non-checkpoint patrol operations in New Hampshire since January 2017. The ACLU of New Hampshire also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the ACLU of New Hampshire filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUS Customs and Border Protection
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-171NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1863459 filed by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of New Hampshire. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A_FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit B_Jose I-213, # 3 Exhibit C_Florentin I-213, # 4 Exhibit D_FOIA Acknowledgement Letter, # 5 Exhibit E_FOIA Expedited Processing Disposition, # 6 Exhibit F_FOIA Fee Waiver Disposition, # 7 Exhibit G_FOIAonline Released Records, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Summons - Waiver, # 10 Summons - Waiver, # 11 Summons - Waiver)(Kim, SangYeob) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-172NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gilles R. Bissonnette on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of New Hampshire Attorney Gilles R. Bissonnette added to party American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of New Hampshire(pty:pla).(Bissonnette, Gilles) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-17Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-977-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-17NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click HERE . (mc) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-173Summonses issued electronically as to US Customs and Border Protection. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: # 1 Notice ECF)(mc) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-194NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry Klementowicz on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of New Hampshire Attorney Henry Klementowicz added to party American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of New Hampshire(pty:pla).(Klementowicz, Henry) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-10-095Return of Service Executed as to US Customs and Border Protection In FOIA CASE (5 U.S.C. 552(a)(4)(C)) by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of New Hampshire. Served/Mailed on 9/24/2019. Answer Follow Up on 11/26/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kim, SangYeob) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-186Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to December 19, 2019 filed by US Customs and Border Protection. Attorney Michael T. McCormack added to party US Customs and Border Protection(pty:dft).(McCormack, Michael) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar