Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSTATE OF NEW JERSEY, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DistrictDistrict of New Jersey
CityTrenton
Case Number3:2019cv18036
Date Filed2019-09-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Brian R. Martinotti
PlaintiffSTATE OF NEW JERSEY, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
Case DescriptionThe New Jersey Attorney General's Office submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Education for records concerning the agency's publication of a revised system of records eliminating the routine use exception for disclosure of student information to other law enforcement agencies. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing from the agency, the Attorney General submitted a FOIA request concerning the operation of the new revision. The agency again acknowledged that request. The agency told the AG that it was processing the requests. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, the AG filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-171COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (Filing and Admin fee $ 400), filed by STATE OF NEW JERSEY, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibits)(MORAMARCO, GLENN) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-172Request for Summons to be Issued by STATE OF NEW JERSEY, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (MORAMARCO, GLENN) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-173Request for Summons to be Issued by STATE OF NEW JERSEY, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (MORAMARCO, GLENN) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-174Request for Summons to be Issued by STATE OF NEW JERSEY, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (MORAMARCO, GLENN) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-175Request for Summons to be Issued by STATE OF NEW JERSEY, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (MORAMARCO, GLENN) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-17Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number TRE105928 (abr) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-17Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jdb) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-176SUMMONS ISSUED as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdb) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-237Exhibit to 1 Complaint , Civil Cover Sheet, by STATE OF NEW JERSEY, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL. (MORAMARCO, GLENN) (Entered: 09/23/2019)
2019-10-108CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STATE OF NEW JERSEY, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL re 6 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint (MORAMARCO, GLENN) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-159Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney SUSAN R MILLENKY for UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION added. (MILLENKY, SUSAN) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-16Clerk`s Text Order - The document 9 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by STATE OF NEW JERSEY, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/12/2019. (jmh) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar