Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWESTERN VALUES PROJECT v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02789
Date Filed2019-09-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffWESTERN VALUES PROJECT
Case DescriptionWestern Values Project submitted FOIA requests to the Department of the Interior, the Bureau of Land Management, General Services Administration, and OMB for records sent to either a Senate committee or GSA concerning the relocation of BLM personnel. WVP also requested a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, WVP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DefendantUNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DefendantGENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-181COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6383518) filed by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Summons U.S. Dept. of the Interior, # 15 Summons U.S. Bureau of Land Management, # 16 Summons General Services Admin., # 17 Summons Office of Management and Budget, # 18 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 19 Summons U.S. Attorney for DC, # 20 Supplement Certificate Rule LCvR 26.1)(Massey, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
2019-09-182LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT (zeg) (Entered: 09/20/2019)
2019-09-20Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zeg) (Entered: 09/20/2019)
2019-09-203SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/20/2019)
2019-09-204STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/20/19. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 09/20/2019)
2019-10-155NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Burch on behalf of All Defendants (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-256NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M. Collette on behalf of WESTERN VALUES PROJECT (Collette, Matthew) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2019-10-257RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/04/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/4/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/3/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION served on 10/3/2019; OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 10/9/2019; UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 10/3/2019; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 10/3/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service on the Bureau of Land Management, # 2 Affidavit of Service on the General Services Administration, # 3 Affidavit of Service on the Office of Management and Budget, # 4 Affidavit of Service on the U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Affidavit of Service on the U.S. Attorney's Office for D.C.)(Collette, Matthew) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2019-11-048ANSWER to Complaint by GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Burch, Alan) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-04MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on November 15, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 21. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall confer in advance of the Initial Scheduling Conference on (1) whether any records can be released, and (2) the proper next steps in this litigation. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/4/19. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-04Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2019, at 11:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-15Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 11/15/2019. The Department of the Interior shall provide the 40 pages identified so far; The agencies shall provide their estimates with respect to the quantity of records, and the timetable for reviewing and releasing non-exempt records. Joint Status Report due by 12/15/2019. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 11/15/2019)
2019-12-169Joint STATUS REPORT by GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 12/16/2019)
2019-12-16MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report 9 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties submit a further joint status report on or before January 15, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/16/19. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 12/16/2019)
2020-01-1510Joint STATUS REPORT by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT. (Collette, Matthew) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-21MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report 10 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before February 15, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/21/20. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
2020-01-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/15/2020. (kt) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
2020-02-1811Joint STATUS REPORT by GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 02/18/2020)
2020-02-20MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report 11 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before March 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/20/20. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 02/20/2020)
2020-03-1712Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT (Collette, Matthew) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
2020-03-17MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint motion for extension of time 12 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The parties shall file their joint status report on or before March 31, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/17/20. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
2020-03-3113Joint STATUS REPORT by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT. (Collette, Matthew) (Entered: 03/31/2020)
2020-05-0814Joint STATUS REPORT by GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 05/08/2020)
2020-05-12ENTERED IN ERROR.....MINUTE ORDER as to THOMAS WASHINGTON: Defendant is directed to file a reply, if any, to the government's response to his motion 37 on or before May 19, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/12/20. (lcrdm3, ) Modified on 5/12/2020 entered in wrong case (kt). (Entered: 05/12/2020)
2020-05-12MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report 14 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before June 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/12/20. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 05/12/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar