Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEDDINGTON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02794
Date Filed2019-09-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffPATRICK EDDINGTON
Case DescriptionPatrick Eddington, a researcher at the Cato Institute, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning Amir Mohamed Meshal, a U.S. citizen who had been held by both Kenya and Ethiopia. Eddington also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied Eddington's request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Eddington filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-181COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6383977) filed by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
2019-09-182NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of PATRICK EDDINGTON (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
2019-09-20Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zeg) (Entered: 09/20/2019)
2019-09-203SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/20/2019)
2019-10-034NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-075RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 9/27/2019 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-076RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/26/2019. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-077RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/26/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/26/2019. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-288ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-10-29MINUTE ORDER directing the parties to meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule by November 12, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on October 29, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
2019-11-129Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-13MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 9 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by January 15, 2020, and every 45 days thereafter, to update the Court about the status of Defendant's response to Plaintiff's FOIA request. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on November 13, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
2019-11-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/15/2020 (tj) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
2020-01-1510Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-15MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 10 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a further joint status report by March 19, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on January 15, 2020. (lcrc3) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/19/2020. (tj) (Entered: 01/16/2020)
2020-03-1911Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 03/19/2020)
2020-03-19MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 11 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a further joint status report by June 17, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on March 19, 2020. (lcrc3) (Entered: 03/19/2020)
2020-03-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/17/2020 (tj) (Entered: 03/20/2020)
2020-04-0112Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eric F. Stein, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 04/01/2020)
2020-04-01MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Defendant's consent motion to stay proceedings. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's obligation to process and produce documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request is STAYED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by May 1, 2020, and every 30 days thereafter, until the stay is lifted. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 1, 2020. (lcrc3) (Entered: 04/01/2020)
2020-04-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/1/2020 (zj) (Entered: 04/02/2020)
2020-05-0113Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 05/01/2020)
2020-06-0114Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-07-0115Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 07/01/2020)
2020-07-01MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 15 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the stay on Defendant's obligation to process and produce documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request is LIFTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's next production date shall be August 7, 2020. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before August 14, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 07/01/2020. (lcrc3) (Entered: 07/01/2020)
2020-07-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/14/2020. (tj) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar