Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02796
Date Filed2019-09-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
PlaintiffBUZZFEED, INC.
Case DescriptionBuzzFeed reporter Jason Leopold submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Justice. The first FOIA request asked for records concerning press inquiries pertaining to text messages sent by Peter Strzok and Lisa Page. The second FOIA request asked for records concerning Robert Mueller's congressional testimony. Leopold also requested a fee waiver for both requests. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. For the first request, the agency told Leopold it would invoke a 10-day extension. In response to the second request, the agency told Leopold that it was not able to address his request at present but would start processing it as quickly as possible. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-181COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6384297) filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
2019-09-182NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
2019-09-183LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
2019-09-20Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zeg) (Entered: 09/20/2019)
2019-09-204SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/20/2019)
2019-10-095RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/1/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-096RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/1/2019. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-097RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/1/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/31/2019. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-318NOTICE of Appearance by Amber Richer on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Richer, Amber) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
2019-10-319ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Richer, Amber) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
2019-10-31MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by November 14, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/31/2019. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
2019-10-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 11/14/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-11-1410Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Richer, Amber) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
2019-11-15MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 10 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by December 16, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/15/2019. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 11/15/2019)
2019-11-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/16/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 11/15/2019)
2019-12-1611Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Richer, Amber) (Entered: 12/16/2019)
2019-12-16MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 11 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further Joint Status Report by January 31, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/16/2019. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 12/16/2019)
2019-12-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/31/2020. (nbn) (Entered: 12/18/2019)
2020-01-3112Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Richer, Amber) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-02-03MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 12 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further Joint Status Report by March 13, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/3/2020. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 02/03/2020)
2020-02-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/13/2020. (nbn) (Entered: 02/03/2020)
2020-03-1313Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Richer, Amber) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-13MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 13 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further Joint Status Report by May 15, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/13/2020. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/15/2020. (nbn) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-05-1514Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Richer, Amber) (Entered: 05/15/2020)
2020-05-18MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 14 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further Joint Status Report by June 19, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/18/2020. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-05-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/19/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-06-1915Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Richer, Amber) (Entered: 06/19/2020)
2020-06-19MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 15 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further Joint Status Report by July 20, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/19/2020. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 06/19/2020)
2020-06-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/20/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-07-2016Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Richer, Amber) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-20MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 16 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further Joint Status Report by August 19, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/20/2020. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/19/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 07/21/2020)
2020-08-1917Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Richer, Amber) (Entered: 08/19/2020)
2020-08-19MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 17 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by September 18, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/19/2020. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 08/19/2020)
2020-08-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/18/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 08/21/2020)
2020-09-1818Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Richer, Amber) (Entered: 09/18/2020)
2020-09-21MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 18 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a proposed briefing schedule by September 25, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/21/2020. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
2020-09-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 9/25/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
2020-09-2519PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Richer, Amber) (Entered: 09/25/2020)
2020-09-25MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 19 Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule and ORDERS that: 1) Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by November 24, 2020; (2) Plaintiffs shall file their cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion by January 25, 2021; (3) Defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion and opposition to Plaintiffs' cross-motion by February 24, 2021; and (4) Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their cross-motion by March 26, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/25/2020. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 09/25/2020)
2020-09-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 11/24/2020. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/25/2021. Cross Motions due by 1/25/2021. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/24/2021. Response to Cross Motions due by 2/24/2021. Reply to Cross Motions due by 3/26/2021. (znbn) (Entered: 09/28/2020)
2020-11-1720Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Richer, Amber) (Entered: 11/17/2020)
2020-11-17MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent 20 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by December 8, 2020; (2) Plaintiffs shall file their cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion by January 25, 2021; (3) Defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion and opposition to Plaintiffs' cross-motion by February 24, 2021; and (4) Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their cross-motion by March 26, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/17/2020. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 11/17/2020)
2020-11-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 12/8/2020. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/25/2021. Cross Motions due by 1/25/2021. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/24/2021. Response to Cross Motions due by 2/24/2021. Reply to Cross Motions due by 3/26/2021. (znbn) (Entered: 11/18/2020)
2020-12-0821Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Richer, Amber) (Entered: 12/08/2020)
2020-12-08MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent 21 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by December 11, 2020; and 2) All other briefing deadlines remain unchanged. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/8/2020. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 12/08/2020)
2020-12-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 12/11/2020. (nbn) (Entered: 12/08/2020)
2020-12-1122MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Vanessa R. Brinkmann, # 3 Declaration Declaration of Paul P. Colborn, # 4 Statement of Facts, # 5 Text of Proposed Order, # 6 Certificate of Service)(Richer, Amber) (Entered: 12/11/2020)
2021-01-2523Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Exhibit A-J, # 4 Exhibit K-T, # 5 Exhibit U-W, # 6 Statement of Facts Response to Statement of Facts, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 01/25/2021)
2021-01-2524Memorandum in opposition to re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Exhibit A-J, # 3 Exhibit K-T, # 4 Exhibit U-W, # 5 Statement of Facts Response to Statement of Facts, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 01/25/2021)
2021-02-1825Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 23 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richer, Amber) (Entered: 02/18/2021)
2021-02-18MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent 25 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion and opposition to Plaintiffs' cross-motion by March 3, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/18/2021. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 02/18/2021)
2021-02-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply to Cross Motions due by 3/3/2021. (znbn) (Entered: 02/19/2021)
2021-03-0326Memorandum in opposition to re 23 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Second Brinkmann Declaration, # 2 Declaration Second Colborn Declaration, # 3 Statement of Facts Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Facts, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Richer, Amber) (Entered: 03/03/2021)
2021-03-0327REPLY to opposition to motion re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Second Brinkmann Declaration, # 2 Declaration Second Colborn Declaration, # 3 Statement of Facts Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Facts, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Richer, Amber) (Entered: 03/03/2021)
2021-03-2228Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-03-22MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Unopposed 28 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their cross-motion by April 9, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/22/2021. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-03-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply to Cross Motions due by 4/9/2021. (znbn) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-04-0829STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/08/2021)
2021-04-08MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties 29 Stipulation, the Court ORDERS that Count II is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/8/2021. (lcjeb1) Modified on 4/8/2021 (nbn). (Entered: 04/08/2021)
2021-04-0930REPLY to opposition to motion re 23 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/09/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar