Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMARTINEZ v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02801
Date Filed2019-09-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffFREDDY MARTINEZ
Case DescriptionFreddy Martinez, a journalist, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning contracts awarded to General Dynamics Information Technology by the Office of Refugee Resettlement. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Martinez's request was ultimately transferred to the Program Support Center for processing. After hearing nothing from the agency, Martinez filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Martinez field suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-181COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6385125) filed by FREDDY MARTINEZ. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Summons)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
2019-09-182NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of FREDDY MARTINEZ (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
2019-09-20Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zeg) (Entered: 09/20/2019)
2019-09-203SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/20/2019)
2019-09-204STANDING ORDER establishing procedures for cases before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are directed to read and strictly comply with the attached order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/20/2019. (Entered: 09/20/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar