Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02813
Date Filed2019-09-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning communications between DOJ officials and the White House on certain congressional oversight topics. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-191COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6385767) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-192LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-20Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zeg) (Entered: 09/20/2019)
2019-09-203SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/20/2019)
2019-09-264STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 09/26/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 09/26/2019)
2019-10-095RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/20/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/20/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/30/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 9/30/2019 (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-166NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Alexander McGrath on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (McGrath, Daniel) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/18/2019) (zjf). (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-217NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander V. Sverdlov on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Sverdlov, Alexander) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-10-218Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Sverdlov, Alexander) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-10-21MINUTE ORDER granting 8 defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time. Defendant shall file a response to plaintiff's complaint by no later than November 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/21/019. (lcegs2) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-10-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Response To The Plaintiff's Complaint due by 11/4/2019. (mac) (Entered: 10/22/2019)
2019-10-229NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. Attorney Cerissa Cafasso terminated. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 10/22/2019)
2019-11-0410ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Sverdlov, Alexander) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2020-01-09MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA), 5 U.S.C. § 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than February 10, 2020. The parties joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) The status of plaintiffs FOIA request; (2) The anticipated number of documents responsive to plaintiffs FOIA request; (3) The anticipated date(s) for release of documents responsive to plaintiffs FOIA request; (4) Whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) Whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) Whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) A proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each partys individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/9/2020. (lcegs2) (Entered: 01/09/2020)
2020-01-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Joint Scheduling Order due by 2/10/2020. (mac) (Entered: 01/10/2020)
2020-02-1011Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 02/10/2020)
2020-02-11MINUTE ORDER. In light of 11 Parties Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report by no later than March 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/11/2020. (lcegs2) (Entered: 02/11/2020)
2020-02-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/10/2020. (mac) (Entered: 02/12/2020)
2020-03-1012Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 03/10/2020)
2020-03-10MINUTE ORDER. In light of 12 Parties Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report by no later than June 18, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/10/2020. (lcegs2) (Entered: 03/10/2020)
2020-03-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/18/2020. (mac) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar