Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLesemann & Associates LLC v. U S Department of the Treasury
DistrictDistrict of South Carolina
CityCharleston
Case Number2:2019cv02638
Date Filed2019-09-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Bruce Howe Hendricks
PlaintiffLesemann & Associates LLC
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Lesemann & Associates submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Treasury for records sent or received by the agency from the SC Housing Corp. of South Carolina. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told the law firm that if it narrowed the scope of the request it would respond more quickly. The agency also told the law firm that it was processing the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Lesemann & Associates filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU S Department of the Treasury
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-181COMPLAINT against U S Department of the Treasury ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8674830.), filed by Lesemann & Associates LLC. Service due by 12/17/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Email from C.P at UST, # 2 Exhibit B: Emails btwn JTP & CP, # 3 Exhibit C: Letter from UST, # 4 Exhibit D: Emails from CH at UST). (vdru, ) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-182Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Lesemann & Associates LLC.(vdru, ) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-183Summons Issued as to U S Department of the Treasury, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (vdru, ) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-10-246Joint MOTION for Extension of Time by U S Department of the Treasury. Response to Motion due by 11/7/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Modica, Matthew) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-287TEXT ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendants shall have until November 12, 2019, to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Entered at the Direction of The Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 10/28/2019.(vdru, ) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-11-129ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by U S Department of the Treasury.(Modica, Matthew) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-1210Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by U S Department of the Treasury.(Modica, Matthew) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-1811CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 12/9/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 12/23/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 12/23/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/13/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/12/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/13/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/13/2020, Discovery due by 5/12/2020, Motions due by 6/11/2020, Trial Deadline 9/9/2020, Mediation Due by 5/12/2020. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 11/18/2019. (vdru, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)
2019-11-1812MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 5/12/2020. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 11/18/2019. (vdru, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar