Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWITTES et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02823
Date Filed2019-09-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffBENJAMIN WITTES
PlaintiffSCOTT R. ANDERSON
PlaintiffPROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.
Case DescriptionBenjamin Wittes and Scott Anderson of Lawfare, and the Protect Democracy Project submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning communications between agency officials and President Trump or White House officials pertaining to Andrew McCabe. Wittes' second FOIA request asked for communications sent to or from former acting Attorney General Matthew Whittaker pertaining to McCabe. Wittes also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Wittes filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-201COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6389255) filed by BENJAMIN WITTES, PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC., SCOTT R. ANDERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Summons, # 6 Certificate Rule LCvR 26.1)(Florence, Justin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/23/2019) (zeg). (Entered: 09/20/2019)
2019-09-202LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (zeg) (Entered: 09/23/2019)
2019-09-23Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zeg) (Entered: 09/23/2019)
2019-09-243SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/24/2019)
2019-10-074RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/30/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/30/2019. (Florence, Justin) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-075RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/04/19. (Florence, Justin) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-076RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 9/30/2019 (Florence, Justin) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-077MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Deana K. El-Mallawany, :Firm- THE PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC., :Address- 125 Walnut Street, Suite 202, Watertown, MA 02472. Phone No. - (646) 943-3755. Fax No. - (929) 777-8428 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6427625. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SCOTT R. ANDERSON, PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC., BENJAMIN WITTES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Deana K El-Mallawany, # 2 Proposed Order)(Florence, Justin) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-078MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kristy Parker, :Firm- PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC., :Address- 2020 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, #163, Washington, D.C. 20006. Phone No. - (202) 424-9906. Fax No. - (929) 777-8428 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6427645. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SCOTT R. ANDERSON, PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC., BENJAMIN WITTES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kristy Parker, # 2 Proposed Order)(Florence, Justin) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-079MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John Langford, :Firm- THE PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC., :Address- 555 W. 5th St., Los Angeles, CA 90013. Phone No. - (919) 619-9819. Fax No. - (929) 777-8428 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6427652. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SCOTT R. ANDERSON, PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC., BENJAMIN WITTES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John Langford, # 2 Proposed Order)(Florence, Justin) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-1010GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/10/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-1011MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by SCOTT R. ANDERSON, PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC., BENJAMIN WITTES (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Pls.' Mot. for a Prelim. Inj., # 2 Declaration of Ian Bassin in Supp. of Pls.' Mot. for a Prelim. Inj., # 3 Declaration of Benjamin Wittes in Supp. of Pls.' Mot. for a Prelim. Inj., # 4 Declaration of John Langford, # 5 Exhibit A to Langford Decl., # 6 Exhibit B to Langford Decl., # 7 Exhibit C to Langford Decl., # 8 Exhibit D to Langford Decl., # 9 Exhibit E to Langford Decl., # 10 Exhibit F to Langford Decl., # 11 Exhibit G to Langford Decl.)(Florence, Justin) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-15MINUTE ORDER granting 7 , 8 , 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Kristy Parker, John Langford, and Deana K. El-Mallawany are admitted pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Plaintiffs. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a).For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf . Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/15/2019. (jag) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar