Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSMITH v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02765
Date Filed2019-09-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffKEVIN P. SMITH
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantUNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-12Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 9/12/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zjd) (Entered: 09/20/2019)
2019-09-121COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL filed by KEVIN P. SMITH. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibits)(zjd) (Entered: 09/20/2019)
2019-09-122MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by KEVIN P. SMITH. (zjd) (Entered: 09/20/2019)
2019-10-083PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/7/19. (zmd) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar