Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-09-23 | 1 | COMPLAINT against EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6393289) filed by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet, # 11 Summons)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 09/23/2019) |
2019-09-25 | | Case Assigned to Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (zeg) (Entered: 09/25/2019) |
2019-09-25 | 2 | SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/25/2019) |
2019-10-07 | 3 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS served on 10/3/2019; FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 10/1/2019; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/3/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/3/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/2/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/03/19. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavits of Mailing)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 10/07/2019) |
2019-10-09 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball on behalf of All Defendants (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 10/09/2019) |
2019-10-31 | 5 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 10/31/2019) |
2019-11-04 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Accordingly, the defendants' response to the plaintiff's complaint shall be filed on or before November 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on November 4, 2019. (JK) (Entered: 11/04/2019) |
2019-11-04 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/12/2019. (JK) (Entered: 11/04/2019) |
2019-11-12 | 6 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 11/12/2019) |
2019-11-15 | 7 | ANSWER to Complaint by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 11/15/2019) |
2019-11-15 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Accordingly, the defendants response to the complaint shall be filed on or before November 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on November 15, 2019. (JK) (Entered: 11/15/2019) |
2019-11-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 11/15/2019, (hs) (Entered: 11/18/2019) |
2019-11-18 | | MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to confer and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request, and the anticipated date(s) for the release of requested documents that are still being processed, if any. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before December 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on November 18, 2019. (JK) (Entered: 11/18/2019) |
2019-11-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/13/2019 (hs) (Entered: 11/18/2019) |
2019-11-20 | 8 | NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Alexander Marshall on behalf of REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS (Marshall, Adam) (Entered: 11/20/2019) |
2019-12-13 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 12/13/2019) |
2019-12-18 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before January 7, 2020. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on December 18, 2019. (JK) (Entered: 12/18/2019) |
2019-12-19 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2020 (hs) (Entered: 12/19/2019) |
2020-01-03 | 10 | NOTICE of Appearance by Gunita Singh on behalf of REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS (Singh, Gunita) (Entered: 01/03/2020) |
2020-01-07 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 01/07/2020) |
2020-01-22 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before February 6, 2020. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on January 22, 2020. (JK) (Entered: 01/22/2020) |
2020-01-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/6/2020 (hs) (Entered: 01/23/2020) |
2020-02-06 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 02/06/2020) |
2020-02-10 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before February 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on February 10, 2020. (JK) (Entered: 02/10/2020) |
2020-02-11 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/20/2020 (hs) (Entered: 02/11/2020) |
2020-02-20 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 02/20/2020) |
2020-02-24 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Fourth Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that this case shall proceed as follows: the defendants' motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before April 30, 2020; the plaintiff's combined cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to the defendant's motion shall be filed on or before June 5, 2020; the defendants' combined opposition to the plaintiff's cross-motion and reply shall be filed on or before July 7, 2020; and the plaintiff's reply shall be filed on or before July 28, 2020. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on February 24, 2020. (JK) (Entered: 02/24/2020) |
2020-02-24 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Cross Motions due by 6/5/2020. Defense's Response to Cross Motions due by 7/7/2020. Plaintiff's Reply to Cross Motions due by 7/28/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 02/24/2020) |
2020-04-29 | 14 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 04/29/2020) |
2020-05-04 | | MINUTE ORDER: GRANTING 14 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment. The following schedule shall govern these proceedings: the defendants' motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before June 2, 2020; the plaintiff's combined cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to the defendant's motion shall be filed on or before July 2, 2020; the defendants' combined opposition to the plaintiff's cross-motion and reply shall be filed on or before August 3, 2020; and the plaintiff's reply shall be filed on or before August 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on May 4, 2020. (SM) (Entered: 05/04/2020) |
2020-05-04 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 8/24/2020. Summary Judgment motions due by 6/2/2020. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/2/2020. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/3/2020. (hs) (Entered: 05/04/2020) |
2020-06-02 | 15 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Statement of Facts, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 06/02/2020) |
2020-07-02 | 16 | Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration of Adam A. Marshall, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 07/02/2020) |
2020-07-02 | 17 | Memorandum in opposition re 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration of Adam A. Marshall, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Townsend, KatieLynn) Modified docket event/text on 7/2/2020 (eg). (Entered: 07/02/2020) |
2020-08-03 | 18 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Combined Opposition and Reply Brief by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 08/03/2020) |
2020-08-04 | | MINUTE ORDER: GRANTING 18 defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Combined Opposition and Reply Brief. The defendants' combined opposition and reply shall be filed on or before August 6, 2020; and the plaintiff's reply shall be filed on or before August 27, 2020. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on August 4, 2020. (SM). (Entered: 08/04/2020) |
2020-08-04 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Response/Reply due by 8/6/2020 Plaintiff's Reply due by 8/27/2020. (hs) (Entered: 08/04/2020) |
2020-08-06 | 19 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 08/06/2020) |
2020-08-06 | 20 | Memorandum in opposition to re 16 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 08/06/2020) |
2020-08-27 | 21 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 16 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS. (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 08/27/2020) |
2021-06-24 | | MINUTE ORDER: A hearing on 15 Defendants' motion for summary judgment and 16 Plaintiff's cross motion for partial summary judgment is hereby SET for Wednesday, August 25, 2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on June 24, 2021. (JRM) (Entered: 06/24/2021) |
2021-06-25 | | Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2021 at 10:00 AM by VTC before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (hs) (Entered: 06/25/2021) |
2021-06-25 | | Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing reset for 8/25/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (hs) (Entered: 06/25/2021) |
2021-07-15 | 22 | NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 07/15/2021) |
2021-08-05 | 23 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Paul Cirino on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Katherine B. Palmer-Ball (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 08/05/2021) |
2021-08-09 | 24 | Consent MOTION to Continue Motions Hearing by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 08/09/2021) |
2021-08-09 | | MINUTE ORDER: GRANTING 24 Defendants' Consent Motion to Continue Motion Hearing. The hearing on 15 Defendants' motion for summary judgment and 16 Plaintiff's cross motion for partial summary judgment is hereby rescheduled for Monday, September 20, 2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on August 9, 2021. (JRM) (Entered: 08/09/2021) |
2021-08-10 | | Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing reset for 9/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26A - In Person before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (hs) (Entered: 08/10/2021) |
2021-08-16 | 25 | RESPONSE re 22 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 08/16/2021) |
2021-09-20 | | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas F. Hogan: Motion Hearing held on 9/20/2021, re 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment and 16 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Oral arguments heard and a written memorandum to be issued via Chambers. (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman) (zgdf) (Entered: 09/20/2021) |
2021-11-08 | 26 | ORDER granting in part and denying in part 15 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 16 Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on November 8, 2021. (CR) (Entered: 11/08/2021) |
2021-11-08 | 27 | MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on November 8, 2021. (CR) (Entered: 11/08/2021) |
2022-01-28 | 28 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Production Deadline by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 01/28/2022) |
2022-01-31 | | MINUTE ORDER: GRANTING 28 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with Production Deadline. The FBI and the Department of Justice's Criminal Division shall have until March 9, 2022, to complete supplemental searches for responsive records and to produce any additional responsive records to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on January 31, 2022. RLG. (Entered: 01/31/2022) |
2022-03-03 | 29 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Production Deadline by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 03/03/2022) |
2022-03-07 | | MINUTE ORDER: GRANTING 29 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with Production Deadline. The Department of Justice's Criminal Division shall have until April 25, 2022, to complete supplemental searches for responsive records and to produce any additional responsive records to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on March 7, 2022. (RLG). (Entered: 03/07/2022) |
2022-08-12 | 30 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Stephanie R. Johnson on behalf of EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Paul Cirino (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/12/2022) |
2022-11-23 | 31 | Joint STATUS REPORT by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 11/23/2022) |
2023-01-12 | 32 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Joshua Ontell on behalf of EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Stephanie Johnson (Ontell, Joshua) (Entered: 01/12/2023) |
2023-01-30 | 33 | Joint STATUS REPORT by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS. (Marshall, Adam) (Entered: 01/30/2023) |
2023-02-24 | | Case directly reassigned to District Judge Ana C. Reyes. Judge Thomas F. Hogan is no longer assigned to the case. (rj) (Entered: 02/24/2023) |
2023-02-28 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 33 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file by April 28, 2023, an additional joint status report advising the Court of the status of this matter, including a recommendation for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 2/28/2023. (lcjo) (Entered: 02/28/2023) |
2023-03-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 4/28/2023. (zcdw) (Entered: 03/02/2023) |
2023-03-22 | 34 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by M. Jared Littman on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Joshua Ontell (Littman, M. Jared) (Entered: 03/22/2023) |
2023-04-28 | 35 | Joint STATUS REPORT by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 04/28/2023) |
2023-04-28 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file by May 21, 2023 an additional joint status report advising the Court of the status of this matter, including a recommendation for further proceedings. The Court notes that the parties are not required to seek the Court's approval to file further joint status reports per Judge Reyes' Standing Order in Civil Cases. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 4/28/23. (lcas) (Entered: 04/28/2023) |
2023-04-28 | 36 | STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 4/28/2023. (lcas) (Entered: 04/28/2023) |
2023-04-30 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 5/21/2023. (zcdw) (Entered: 04/30/2023) |
2023-05-21 | 37 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Littman, M.) (Entered: 05/21/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |